House | 03/27/2024 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | File Number 2 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Calendar Number 29 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |