Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
File Number 602
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 343
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 4111
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 4106
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4029
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
File Number 225
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Calendar Number 166
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|