Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05168 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/19/2024

                     
Researcher: JS 	Page 1 	4/19/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5168 (as amended by House "A" and "C")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING SOLAR INSTALLATIONS IN 
CONDOMINIUMS AND COOPERATIVES.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires common interest communities to assess a unit 
owner for any increase in common expenses (e.g., maintenance, repair, 
or insurance costs) that result from the owner’s addition, alteration, or 
improvement. (Common interest communities include condominiums, 
cooperatives, and planned communities.) 
Separately, the bill prohibits enforcing any provisions in a 
condominium or planned community declaration or bylaws that 
unreasonably restrict solar generating systems (i.e., solar panels) on the 
roofs of single-family detached units or that otherwise conflict with the 
bill’s solar panel requirements, beginning January 1, 2025. It also 
establishes (1) a solar panel approval process for unit owners and these 
associations to follow; (2) terms to which the unit owner must agree 
(e.g., to assume certain costs and indemnify the association); and (3) a 
period during which associations may opt out of the bill’s solar panel-
related requirements. In doing so, the bill repeals a current, narrower 
provision that restricts planned community associations (but not 
condominiums or cooperatives) from barring solar panels on units that 
do not share a roof. 
The bill additionally authorizes associations to install solar panels on 
any common elements for all unit owners’ use and develop rules for 
their use. It also makes minor and conforming changes.  
*House Amendment “A” makes two changes in the bill’s provisions 
on solar panels installed in associations. It (1) deems applications 
approved if an association requests additional information and does not 
issue a decision within 30 days of receiving the information and (2)  2024HB-05168-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JS 	Page 2 	4/19/24 
 
allows associations to require unit owners to remove any solar panels 
before selling their units if the prospective buyers do not agree to take 
over any solar panel leasing agreements (and correspondingly requires 
sellers to notify buyers of this).  
*House Amendment “C” excludes cooperatives from the bill’s 
provisions on panels installed on single-family detached units in 
associations.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: January 1, 2025, except the provision on increases 
in common assessments is effective October 1, 2024.  
APPROVAL PROCESS 
The bill requires condominium or planned community unit owners 
to get their association’s approval to install solar panels on single-family 
detached units. The unit owner must apply with the association’s 
executive board and do so in the form and way directed by the board. 
Upon receiving the unit owner’s application, the board must 
acknowledge receipt in writing within 30 days and issue a written 
decision within 60 days, unless it requests additional information. If the 
board asks the owner to provide additional information about the 
proposal, it has up to 30 days after receiving the information to deny it. 
The application is deemed approved if the board does not deny it in 
writing within these timeframes.  
The board must process these applications in the same way 
applications for additions, alterations, or improvements are processed 
under the association’s bylaws or declaration. And it may not 
unreasonably withhold approval if the unit owner complies with the 
bill’s requirements.  
AGREEMENT TERMS AND OWNER RESPONSIBILITI ES  
Under the bill, if the application is approved or deemed approved, 
the unit owner and association must enter a written agreement. The 
agreement may be recorded in the land records of the town or towns in 
which the association is located. The agreement must require the unit 
owner to:  2024HB-05168-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JS 	Page 3 	4/19/24 
 
1. comply with the declaration or bylaws regarding additions, 
alterations, or improvements as applicable; 
2. hire a registered and insured contractor to install the solar panels 
who must, within 14 days after the unit owner and association 
execute the agreement, (a) provide a certificate of insurance for at 
least $1 million of liability coverage for the association, its 
manager, and the unit owner; (b) provide proof of any legally 
required workers’ compensation insurance; and (c) give the 
association a mechanic’s lien waiver in its favor;  
3. pay any installation costs (e.g., increased master policy 
premiums, the association’s attorney’s fees, fees for engineers 
and other professionals, and fees for permits and zoning 
compliance requirements);  
4. indemnify other unit owners and the association, its executive 
board, officers, directors, and managers for any damage, loss, or 
financial obligation the solar panels cause; and 
5. assume full responsibility, including sole financial responsibility, 
for maintaining, repairing, and replacing the unit’s roof.  
The bill makes the unit owner, or any successive owner who assumed 
the unit’s title and the owner’s duties under the bill, responsible for 
certain costs, including costs to: 
1. repair, maintain, or replace the solar panels; 
2. repair damage to the association’s common elements or units due 
to installing, using, maintaining, repairing, removing, or 
replacing the panels; 
3. repair the roof after the panels are removed; and 
4. cover common expenses for losses due to the solar panels that are 
uninsured under the association’s master policy.  
Under the bill, the association may also assess the unit owner for any  2024HB-05168-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JS 	Page 4 	4/19/24 
 
uninsured portion of a loss (including deductibles) it incurs due to the 
panels. The association may do so regardless of whether it submits an 
insurance claim.  
Regulatory Requirements 
The bill explicitly requires the solar panels to comply with all 
applicable state, federal, and local health and safety standards and 
requirements. 
Attorney’s Fees 
Under the bill, if the association initiates a legal action to enforce 
compliance with the written agreement or any of the bill’s related 
requirements, the prevailing party must be awarded reasonable 
attorney’s fees.  
SUCCESSIVE OWNERS AND BUYERS 
The bill requires the unit owner, or any successive owner, to disclose 
to any prospective buyers the (1) existence of the solar panels and any 
related agreements with the association; (2) unit owner’s responsibilities 
associated with the solar panels; and (3) requirement that the buyer will 
own the solar panels or take over any agreement the unit owner has with 
the panel owner (e.g., a lease agreement), unless they are removed 
before the sale.  
The association may require the unit owner to remove the panels 
before the sale if the buyer does not agree to (1) take over ownership of 
the solar panels or any leasing or other agreement for them; (2) be bound 
by the indemnification agreement; and (3) be responsible for the full 
costs of maintaining, repairing, and replacing the unit’s roof.  
OPT-OUT 
Associations formed by January 1, 2025, may opt out of the bill’s solar 
panel prohibition and requirements if they do so by December 31, 2026. 
To opt out, at least 75% of the association’s board of directors must vote 
to do so. Within 30 days after the favorable vote to opt out, the 
association must record notice of it in the land records of the town or 
towns in which the association owns real property (e.g., land or  2024HB-05168-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JS 	Page 5 	4/19/24 
 
buildings).  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Planning and Development Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 21 Nay 0 (03/15/2024) 
 
Judiciary Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 35 Nay 0 (04/12/2024)