House | 04/08/2024 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | File Number 45 | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Calendar Number 61 | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/24 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |