House
|
06/04/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Public Act 24-112
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
File Number 629
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 383
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4859
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 4546
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
File Number 96
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Calendar Number 92
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|