House | 03/25/2024 | File Number 101 | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | House Calendar Number 97 | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |