House
|
06/04/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Public Act 24-115
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
File Number 649
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 415
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4874
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
File Number 102
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Calendar Number 98
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|