House | 06/05/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/29/2024 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/29/2024 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Special Act 24-7 | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 328 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | File Number 230 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Calendar Number 171 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |