Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05291 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/25/2024

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	3/25/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5291  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH'S 
RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING IMPROVED OPIOID 
MONITORING.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires hospitals that treat a patient for a nonfatal opioid 
drug overdose to administer a toxicology screening if it is medically 
appropriate and the patient consents to it. At a minimum, the screening 
must test for opiates, opioids, benzodiazepines, cannabinoids, 
methadone, cocaine, gabapentin, xylazine, and other substances the 
Department of Public Health (DPH) commissioner deems appropriate. 
Hospitals must perform the toxicology screenings for a three-and-a-
half-year period, from January 1, 2025, to August 1, 2028, and report the 
screening results to DPH as the commissioner prescribes.  
Additionally, the bill requires the DPH commissioner, by January 1, 
2026, and annually afterwards until January 1, 2029, to report to the 
Public Health Committee on the toxicology screening results they 
receive. The report must (1) identify and analyze any trends, (2) identity 
any benefits patients experienced when seeking emergency department 
care for their overdose, and (3) recommend whether hospitals should 
continue toxicology screening reporting after August 31, 2028.  
Under the bill, the toxicology screening results hospitals report to 
DPH generally (1) are confidential and not subject to disclosure, (2) are 
not admissible as evidence in any court or agency proceeding, and (3) 
must be used solely for medical or scientific research or disease control 
or prevention purposes.   
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2024 
  2024HB-05291-R000105-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	3/25/24 
 
BACKGROUND 
Reporting Opioid Drug Overdoses 
By law, any hospital or emergency medical services (EMS) personnel 
that treat a patient for an opioid overdose must report the overdose to 
DPH. The department must then provide the data to the municipal or 
district health department that has jurisdiction over the overdose 
location, or, if that location is unknown, the location in which the 
hospital or EMS personnel treated the patient, as DPH in its discretion 
deems necessary to develop preventive initiatives. 
In addition, the law requires hospitals that treat patients for nonfatal 
opioid drug overdoses to administer mental health screenings or patient 
assessments if it is medically appropriate to do so (CGS ยง 19a-127q). 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 37 Nay 0 (03/11/2024)