Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05291 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+
2+
3+LCO \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2024HB-05291-R01-
4+HB.docx
5+1 of 3
6+
7+General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5291
8+February Session, 2024
19
210
311
4-Substitute House Bill No. 5291
5-
6-Public Act No. 24-120
712
813
914 AN ACT CONCERNING THE DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH'S
1015 RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING IMPROVED OPIOID
1116 MONITORING.
1217 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
1318 Assembly convened:
1419
15-Section 1. Section 19a-127q of the general statutes is repealed and the
16-following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2024):
17-(a) On and after January 1, 2019, any hospital licensed pursuant to
18-chapter 368v or emergency medical services personnel, as defined in
19-section 20-206jj, that treats a patient for an overdose of an opioid drug,
20-as defined in section 20-14o, shall report such overdose to the
21-Department of Public Health in a form and manner prescribed by the
22-Commissioner of Public Health.
23-(b) On and after January 1, 2020, any hospital licensed pursuant to
24-chapter 368v that treats a patient for a nonfatal overdose of an opioid
25-drug, as defined in section 20-14o, shall administer a mental health
26-screening or assessment of the patient if medically appropriate, and
27-provide the results of such screening or assessment to the patient if
28-medically appropriate, or to the patient's parent, guardian or legal
29-representative, as applicable, if medically appropriate.
30-(c) On or before January 1, 2020, the Department of Public Health Substitute House Bill No. 5291
20+Section 1. Section 19a-127q of the general statutes is repealed and the 1
21+following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2024): 2
22+(a) On and after January 1, 2019, any hospital licensed pursuant to 3
23+chapter 368v or emergency medical services personnel, as defined in 4
24+section 20-206jj, that treats a patient for an overdose of an opioid drug, 5
25+as defined in section 20-14o, shall report such overdose to the 6
26+Department of Public Health in a form and manner prescribed by the 7
27+Commissioner of Public Health. 8
28+(b) On and after January 1, 2020, any hospital licensed pursuant to 9
29+chapter 368v that treats a patient for a nonfatal overdose of an opioid 10
30+drug, as defined in section 20-14o, shall administer a mental health 11
31+screening or assessment of the patient if medically appropriate, and 12
32+provide the results of such screening or assessment to the patient if 13
33+medically appropriate, or to the patient's parent, guardian or legal 14
34+representative, as applicable, if medically appropriate. 15
35+(c) On or before January 1, 2020, the Department of Public Health 16 Substitute Bill No. 5291
3136
32-Public Act No. 24-120 2 of 3
3337
34-shall provide the data reported pursuant to subsection (a) of this section
35-to the municipal health department or district department of health that
36-has jurisdiction over the location in which such overdose occurred, or,
37-if such location is unknown, the location in which the hospital or
38-emergency medical services personnel treated the patient, as the
39-department, in its discretion, deems necessary to develop preventive
40-initiatives.
41-(d) (1) From January 1, 2025, until August 31, 2028, any hospital
42-licensed pursuant to chapter 368v that treats a patient for a nonfatal
43-overdose of an opioid drug, as defined in section 20-14o, shall
44-administer, with the patient's consent, a toxicology screening of the
45-patient, if medically appropriate. Such screening shall include, but need
46-not be limited to, screening for opiates, opioids, benzodiazepines,
47-cannabinoids, methadone, cocaine, gabapentin, xylazine and any other
48-substance deemed appropriate by the commissioner. Any hospital that
49-administers a toxicology screening pursuant to the provisions of this
50-subsection shall report the screening results to the Department of Public
51-Health in a form and manner prescribed by the commissioner.
52-(2) On or before January 1, 2026, and annually thereafter, until
53-January 1, 2029, the commissioner shall report, in accordance with the
54-provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committee of the
55-General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public
56-health regarding toxicology screening results obtained pursuant to the
57-provisions of this subsection. Such report shall include, but need not be
58-limited to, (A) the identification and analysis of any trends identified as
59-a result of toxicology screening results obtained pursuant to the
60-provisions of this subsection, (B) the identification of any benefits
61-experienced by patients seeking emergency department care for
62-nonfatal overdoses as a result of the toxicology screening results
63-obtained pursuant to this subsection, and (C) a recommendation
64-regarding whether toxicology screening reporting performed pursuant Substitute House Bill No. 5291
38+LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2024HB-05291-
39+R01-HB.docx }
40+2 of 3
6541
66-Public Act No. 24-120 3 of 3
42+shall provide the data reported pursuant to subsection (a) of this section 17
43+to the municipal health department or district department of health that 18
44+has jurisdiction over the location in which such overdose occurred, or, 19
45+if such location is unknown, the location in which the hospital or 20
46+emergency medical services personnel treated the patient, as the 21
47+department, in its discretion, deems necessary to develop preventive 22
48+initiatives. 23
49+(d) (1) From January 1, 2025, until August 31, 2028, any hospital 24
50+licensed pursuant to chapter 368v that treats a patient for a nonfatal 25
51+overdose of an opioid drug, as defined in section 20-14o, shall 26
52+administer, with the patient's consent, a toxicology screening of the 27
53+patient, if medically appropriate. Such screening shall include, but need 28
54+not be limited to, screening for opiates, opioids, benzodiazepines, 29
55+cannabinoids, methadone, cocaine, gabapentin, xylazine and any other 30
56+substance deemed appropriate by the commissioner. Any hospital that 31
57+administers a toxicology screening pursuant to the provisions of this 32
58+subsection shall report the screening results to the Department of Public 33
59+Health in a form and manner prescribed by the commissioner. 34
60+(2) On or before January 1, 2026, and annually thereafter, until 35
61+January 1, 2029, the commissioner shall report, in accordance with the 36
62+provisions of section 11-4a, to the joint standing committee of the 37
63+General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to public 38
64+health regarding toxicology screening results obtained pursuant to the 39
65+provisions of this subsection. Such report shall include, but need not be 40
66+limited to, (A) the identification and analysis of any trends identified as 41
67+a result of toxicology screening results obtained pursuant to the 42
68+provisions of this subsection, (B) the identification of any benefits 43
69+experienced by patients seeking emergency department care for 44
70+nonfatal overdoses as a result of the toxicology screening results 45
71+obtained pursuant to this subsection, and (C) a recommendation 46
72+regarding whether toxicology screening reporting performed pursuant 47
73+to this subsection should continue after August 31, 2028. 48
74+[(d)] (e) Data reported to the Department of Public Health by a 49 Substitute Bill No. 5291
6775
68-to this subsection should continue after August 31, 2028.
69-[(d)] (e) Data reported to the Department of Public Health by a
70-hospital or emergency medical services personnel pursuant to the
71-provisions of this section shall at all times remain confidential pursuant
72-to section 19a-25.
76+
77+LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2024HB-05291-
78+R01-HB.docx }
79+3 of 3
80+
81+hospital or emergency medical services personnel pursuant to the 50
82+provisions of this section shall at all times remain confidential pursuant 51
83+to section 19a-25. 52
84+This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
85+sections:
86+
87+Section 1 October 1, 2024 19a-127q
88+
89+PH Joint Favorable Subst.
7390