House | 04/08/2024 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | File Number 128 | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Calendar Number 114 | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |