Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05308 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 1, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note April 10, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 11, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024
Analysis April 10, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 14, 2024