House | 04/16/2024 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | File Number 409 | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | House Calendar Number 265 | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |