House | 04/03/2024 | File Number 235 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Calendar Number 176 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |