Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05363 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2024
Fiscal Note May 2, 2024
Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note April 3, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 24, 2024
Analysis May 3, 2024
Analysis May 2, 2024
Bill April 3, 2024
Analysis April 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 22, 2024