House
|
06/05/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Public Act 24-126
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
File Number 605
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 342
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3881
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
File Number 152
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Calendar Number 131
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/24 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Public Hearing 03/05
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|