House | 04/17/2024 | File Number 538 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | House Calendar Number 364 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |