House | 04/11/2024 | File Number 461 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | House Calendar Number 304 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |