House | 04/18/2024 | File Number 560 | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | House Calendar Number 380 | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/24 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |