House | 04/15/2024 | File Number 490 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Calendar Number 340 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |