Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05500 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 1, 2024
Fiscal Note April 30, 2024
Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note April 25, 2024
Fiscal Note April 18, 2024
Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 12, 2024
Analysis May 1, 2024
Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis April 17, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 22, 2024