House | 06/06/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2024 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2024 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Public Act 24-151 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Emergency Certification |