Senate | 04/30/2024 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | File Number 198 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 134 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |