House | 04/11/2024 | House Calendar Number 318 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | File Number 70 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 70 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |