Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00135 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/21/2024

                     
Researcher: DC 	Page 1 	3/21/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
SB 135  
 
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A MAXIMUM CHARGE FOR CERTAIN 
OCCUPATIONAL LICENSES, CERTIFICATIONS, PERMITS AND 
REGISTRATIONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill caps at $100 various Department of Consumer Protection 
(DCP) occupational registration, certification, and license fees. In 
general, the capped fees are annual credentialing fees for individuals, 
such as contractors in the trades, but do not include guaranty fund 
contributions or examination fees. In the case of real estate brokers and 
salespersons (§ 7), telecommunications infrastructure layout technicians 
(§ 15), and home inspectors (§ 23), who are licensed biennially, the bill 
correspondingly caps fees at $200. 
The bill also caps at $100 the fee for the following business 
organization certificates of registration that are not issued to 
individuals: mechanical contractor initial or renewal registrations (§§ 12 
& 13) and landscape architecture corporation renewal registrations (§ 
16). Additionally, it reduces the renewal fee for certain new home 
construction contractors that are subject to a one-time 18-month renewal 
(§ 20). 
The bill requires the DCP commissioner to adopt regulations by July 
1, 2025, to ensure that the fee for a license, permit, certification, or 
registration issued by the department to an individual does not exceed 
$100 annually (§ 29). However, the bill excludes from this fee cap 
credentials issued under the Liquor Control Act (i.e., Title 30 of the 
General Statutes). (Presumably, the $100 cap does not apply to related 
fees, such as guaranty fund contributions and exam fees.) 
EFFECTIVE DATE: July 1, 2024, except the provision requiring the 
commissioner to adopt regulations is effective upon passage, and a  2024SB-00135-R000071-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 2 	3/21/24 
 
conforming change is effective July 1, 2025 (§ 26).  
FEE REDUCTIONS 
The bill reduces various occupational registration, certification, and 
license fees. The table below shows each of the fees that the bill reduces 
to $100 annually or $200 biennially. Under existing law and unchanged 
by the bill, fees shown in the table cover a one-year period unless 
otherwise noted.  
Table: License, Certification, or Registration Fees Reduced to $100 Annually or 
$200 Biennially 
Bill Section 
(CGS Citation) 
License, 
Certification, or 
Registration 
Fee Under Current Law 
1 
(20-281c) 
Public accountant 
certificate (limited 
scope of practice) 
$150 one-time license fee 
2 
(20-281d) 
Public accountant 
(with unlimited scope 
of practice) 
$150 initial license fee 
 
$565 renewal fee 
3 
(20-292) 
Architect $190 license fee, whether initial or 
renewal 
4-6 
(20-305, 20-
306 & 20-308) 
Professional engineer; 
land surveyor; 
combined professional 
engineer and land 
surveyor 
$220 initial license fee, or $190 if 
credentialed in another jurisdiction 
under comparable laws 
 
$285 renewal fee 
7 
(20-314) 
Real estate brokers  $1,130 biennial initial license fee 
 
$750 biennial renewal fee 
 
$375 fee for reinstated license, due for 
each year or fraction thereof since it 
lapsed 
7 
(20-314) 
Real estate 
salespersons 
$570 biennial license fee, whether initial 
or renewal 
 
$285 fee for reinstated license, due for 
each year or fraction thereof since it 
lapsed  2024SB-00135-R000071-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 3 	3/21/24 
 
Bill Section 
(CGS Citation) 
License, 
Certification, or 
Registration 
Fee Under Current Law 
8 
(20-333) 
Limited or unlimited 
contractor in the 
trades* 
$150 application fee  
 
(see also § 9 below for license and 
renewal fees) 
9 
(20-335) 
Tradesperson* license  $150 license fee for contractors, 
whether initial or renewal 
 
$120 for other licensees  
 
(see also § 8 above) 
10 
(20-340d) 
Swimming pool builder $150 initial license fee  
11 
(20-340f) 
Residential stair lift 
technician 
$150 initial license fee 
12 & 13  
(20-341u & 20-
341y) 
Mechanical contractor 
(i.e., business entity 
employing plumbing or 
HVAC tradespeople 
for larger-scale 
projects) 
$110 license fee, whether initial or 
renewal 
14 
(20-349) 
Television and radio 
service dealer, 
including combination 
service dealer and 
electronics or radio 
electronics technician  
$200 license fee, whether initial or 
renewal 
15 
(20-357m) 
Telecommunications 
infrastructure layout 
technician 
$315 biennial license fee, whether initial 
or renewal 
16 
(20-369a) 
Landscape 
architecture 
corporation 
$200 renewal fee 
17 
(20-374) 
Landscape architect $280 initial license fee 
 
$160 renewal fee 
18 & 19 
(20-377m & 20-
377s) 
Interior designer  $190 license fee, whether initial or 
renewal 
20 
(20-417b) 
New home 
construction contractor 
$120 license fee, whether initial or 
renewal (see below for additional 
changes)  2024SB-00135-R000071-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 4 	3/21/24 
 
Bill Section 
(CGS Citation) 
License, 
Certification, or 
Registration 
Fee Under Current Law 
21 
(20-421; see 
also 20-427(f)) 
Home improvement 
contractor (HIC) or 
HIC salesperson 
$120 license fee, whether initial or 
renewal  
22 
(20-457) 
Community 
association manager 
$200 renewal fee 
23 
(20-492a) 
Home inspector $250 biennial renewal fee 
24 
(20-511) 
Certified appraiser $375 initial license fee 
 
$285 renewal fee 
25 & 26  
(20-601) 
Pharmacist license or 
temporary permit to 
practice pharmacy 
$200 initial license fee 
 
$105 renewal fee (under current law, 
the renewal fee is $100 until July 1, 
2025, when it increases to $105) 
27 Fund-raising counsel  $120 license fee, whether initial or 
renewal 
28 Paid solicitor  $500 license fee, whether initial or 
renewal 
*Generally covers fields of elevator installation, repair, and maintenance; fire protection 
sprinkler systems; flat glass work; gas hearth; heating, piping, and cooling; irrigation; 
plumbing and piping; residential stair lift; sheet metal; solar; swimming  
§ 20 — NEW HOME CONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS 
By law, new home construction contractor registrations are valid for 
one year and expire annually on March 31, except that certain 
contractors that previously had a two-year registration that expired on 
September 30, 2023, are subject to a one-time 18-month renewal expiring 
March 31, 2025. Current law sets a $180 fee for contractors subject to this 
18-month renewal. The bill decreases this fee to $150 for contractors 
whose renewal date is between July 1, 2024, and March 31, 2025. (It is 
unclear whether any of these contractors have a renewal date in this 
time period.) 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
General Law Committee 
Joint Favorable  2024SB-00135-R000071-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: DC 	Page 5 	3/21/24 
 
Yea 22 Nay 0 (03/07/2024)