Senate | 04/24/2024 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | File Number 303 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 198 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |