House | 05/04/2024 | House Calendar Number 479 | ||
House | 05/04/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | File Number 39 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 59 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/24 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |