Senate | 03/25/2024 | File Number 94 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 81 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/17/2024 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |