Senate | 03/26/2024 | File Number 112 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 99 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Public Hearing 02/29 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |