Senate | 03/13/2024 | File Number 17 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 42 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |