Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Public Act 24-20
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 5460
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
House Calendar Number 451
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4849
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
File Number 310
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 199
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|