Senate | 04/02/2024 | File Number 184 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 136 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |