Senate | 04/16/2024 | File Number 502 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 290 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |