Connecticut 2024 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00209 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/16/2024

                     
Researcher: SM 	Page 1 	4/16/24 
 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sSB 209  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING NONRESIDENT LANDLORD 
REGISTRATION AND INCREASING PENALTIES FOR REPEAT 
BUILDING AND FIRE CODE VIOLATIONS.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires municipalities with a population of at least 25,000 
based on the most recent decennial census (“covered municipalities”) to 
require certain residential property owners and landlords to report 
specified information to the municipality, such as their current 
residential address. Existing law allows, but does not require, all 
municipalities to do so. The bill also modifies the reporting requirement 
for these municipalities to include other identifying information for the 
owner, landlord, or agent in charge of the building. Under current law, 
the identifying information requirement applies only to certain 
individuals associated with a business entity that owns rental property. 
Additionally, under the bill, violators commit a violation, rather than an 
infraction. 
The bill adds complying with the modified reporting requirement to 
the law’s list of landlord responsibilities (§ 2). Under existing law, (1) 
rental agreements cannot allow landlords to receive rent payments for 
any period during which the landlord is noncompliant with these 
responsibilities (CGS § 47a-4a) and (2) a tenant who claims that the 
landlord failed to perform his or her legal duties may generally institute 
an action in Superior Court to seek relief (CGS § 47a-14h).  
The bill also establishes increased penalties for repeat violations of 
the State Building Code, the State Fire Prevention Code and Fire Safety 
Code, and certain written orders by building inspectors.  
Lastly, it makes technical, conforming, and other minor changes, such 
as specifying that the duties of agents in charge of a building include  2024SB-00209-R000502-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 2 	4/16/24 
 
property supervision and maintenance to comply with state and local 
codes.  
EFFECTIVE DATE: October 1, 2024  
§ 1 — MUNICIPAL LANDLORD IDENTIFICATION REQUIREMENTS  
Current law allows municipalities to require nonresident property 
owners and landlords renting to federal Housing Choice Voucher 
program participants (also known as “project-based housing providers” 
or PBHPs) to report certain information to the tax assessor or another 
designated municipal officer. This information must include the 
following:  
1. the owner’s or PBHP’s current residential address, if they are an 
individual, or 
2. the current residential address of (a) the agent in charge of the 
building and (b) each person who exercises day-to-day financial 
or operational control of the property (i.e., “controlling 
participants”), if the owner or PBHP is a business entity that 
owns rental property in the state (i.e., a corporation, partnership, 
trust, or other legally recognized entity).  
For business entities, this report must also include identifying 
information for the controlling participants. 
Identifying Information and Nonresident Owners  
Current law does not define “identifying information,” but under the 
bill it is proof of a person’s name, birthdate, current residential address, 
driver’s license number, or other government-issued identification 
number. The bill also defines nonresident owner, which is a person who 
does not live at the residential rental property and is either (1) an owner 
(i.e., one or more people with legal title to the property or beneficial 
ownership and a right to present use and enjoyment of the premises, 
including mortgagees in possession) or (2) a controlling participant.  
Covered Municipalities 
Under the bill, covered municipalities must require nonresident  2024SB-00209-R000502-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 3 	4/16/24 
 
property owners and PBHPs to report the information described above 
to them. For these municipalities, the bill also expands the reporting 
requirement to include accurate identifying information for the 
nonresident owner, PBHP, or agent in charge. Under current law, 
reports provided to a tax assessor on or after October 1, 2023, are exempt 
from disclosure under the state’s Freedom of Information Act. The bill 
makes these reports exempt regardless of when they were provided. 
Violations of Reporting Requirement 
Under the bill, a person who violates the reporting requirement 
discussed above commits a violation, rather than an infraction as under 
current law (see BACKGROUND). Consequently, the fine for a violation 
under the bill is $100 (rather than being based on the schedule of 
infraction fines) and cannot be paid by mail (CGS § 51-164m(f)).  
Existing law also allows municipalities to adopt an ordinance setting 
a civil penalty for violations of the reporting requirement. The penalty 
cannot exceed $500 for a first violation and $1,000 for subsequent 
violations. Anyone who is assessed a civil penalty may appeal to the 
Superior Court (CGS § 47a-6b).  
§§ 3-5 — INCREASED PENALTIES FOR CERTAIN REPEAT CODE 
VIOLATIONS  
The bill establishes increased penalties for repeat violations of (1) the 
State Building Code; (2) the State Fire Prevention Code and Fire Safety 
Code; and (3) a building inspector’s written order for providing 
additional exits, making repairs or alterations, or removing the building 
or a portion of it. The bill retains current law’s penalties for these 
violations for a first offense (i.e., a fine between $200 and $1,000, 
imprisonment up to six months, or both). Under the bill, the penalties 
for subsequent violations are as follows:  
1. State Building Code or building inspector’s written order: a fine 
between $500 and $2,000, up to one year of imprisonment, or 
both;  
2. State Fire Prevention Code and Fire Safety Code: a fine between 
$500 and $1,000, up to one year of imprisonment, or both.   2024SB-00209-R000502-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: SM 	Page 4 	4/16/24 
 
Under existing law, unchanged by the bill, the fire code-related 
violations may also be subject to a fine of $50 per day for each day the 
violation continues.  
BACKGROUND 
Infractions  
Infractions are punishable by fines, usually set by Superior Court 
judges, of between $35 and $90, plus a $20 or $35 surcharge and an 
additional fee based on the amount of the fine. There may be other 
added charges depending upon the type of infraction. For example, 
certain motor vehicle infractions trigger a Special Transportation Fund 
surcharge of 50% of the fine. An infraction is not a crime, and violators 
can pay the fine by mail without making a court appearance. 
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Housing Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference - JUD 
Yea 13 Nay 2 (03/07/2024) 
 
Judiciary Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 29 Nay 7 (03/28/2024)