Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Public Act 24-102
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
House Calendar Number 453
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4072
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
File Number 304
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 201
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|