Senate | 05/29/2024 | Vetoed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Public Act 24-25 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | House Calendar Number 323 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | File Number 181 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 139 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |