House | 05/04/2024 | House Calendar Number 481 | ||
House | 05/04/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | File Number 248 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 174 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |