Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00264 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 10, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis August 5, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024
Analysis April 10, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 17, 2024