Senate | 03/21/2024 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |