House | 05/02/2024 | House Calendar Number 437 | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | File Number 222 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 168 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |