Senate | 04/22/2024 | File Number 572 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 351 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |