Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note April 9, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 14, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2024
Bill April 9, 2024
Analysis April 9, 2024