House | 05/03/2024 | House Calendar Number 474 | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/03/2024 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5201 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | File Number 223 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 169 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |