Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00425 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 2, 2024
Fiscal Note April 29, 2024
Fiscal Note April 24, 2024
Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Bill March 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2024
Analysis April 17, 2024