Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Public Act 24-106
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2024
|
House Calendar Number 490
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4882
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
File Number 527
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Calendar Number 305
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|