Senate | 04/08/2024 | File Number 314 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 224 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |