Senate | 07/11/2024 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 07/08/2024 | Public Act 24-1 | ||
Senate | 07/01/2024 | Signed by Governor in Original | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | House Passed | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Immediate Transmittal to the House | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 6219 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6218 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6220 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Emergency Certification |