7 | 16 | | |
---|
8 | 17 | | |
---|
9 | 18 | | |
---|
10 | 19 | | AN ACT ADDING CERTAIN PLANTS TO THE INVASIVE PLANTS LIST. |
---|
11 | 20 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
12 | 21 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
13 | 22 | | |
---|
14 | 23 | | Section 1. Section 22a-381d of the general statutes is repealed and the 1 |
---|
15 | 24 | | following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage): 2 |
---|
16 | 25 | | (a) Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section and 3 |
---|
17 | 26 | | notwithstanding the provisions of any ordinance adopted by a 4 |
---|
18 | 27 | | municipality, no person shall import, move, sell, purchase, transplant, 5 |
---|
19 | 28 | | cultivate or distribute any of the following invasive plants: (1) Curly 6 |
---|
20 | 29 | | leaved Pondweed (Potamogeton crispus); (2) fanwort (Cabomba 7 |
---|
21 | 30 | | caroliniana); (3) eurasian water milfoil (Myriophyllum spicatum); (4) 8 |
---|
22 | 31 | | variable water milfoil (Myriophyllum heterophyllum); (5) water 9 |
---|
23 | 32 | | chestnut (Trapa natans); (6) egeria (Egeria densa); (7) hydrilla (Hydrilla 10 |
---|
24 | 33 | | verticillata); (8) common barberry (Berberis vulgaris); (9) autumn olive 11 |
---|
25 | 34 | | (Elaeagnus umbellata); (10) Bell's honeysuckle (Lonicera xbella); (11) 12 |
---|
26 | 35 | | amur honeysuckle (Lonicera maackii); (12) Morrow's honeysuckle 13 |
---|
27 | 36 | | (Lonicera morrowii); (13) common buckthorn (Rhamnus cathartica); 14 |
---|
28 | 37 | | (14) multiflora rose (Rosa multiflora); (15) Oriental bittersweet 15 |
---|
29 | 38 | | (Celastrus orbiculatus); (16) garlic mustard (Alliaria petiolata); (17) 16 |
---|
30 | 39 | | narrowleaf bittercress (Cardamine impatiens); (18) spotted knapweed 17 |
---|
38 | 48 | | perennial pepperweed (Lepidium latifolium); (24) Japanese knotweed 21 |
---|
39 | 49 | | (Polygonum cuspidatum); (25) mile-a-minute vine (Polygonum 22 |
---|
40 | 50 | | perfoliatum); (26) fig buttercup (Ranunculus ficaria); (27) coltsfoot 23 |
---|
41 | 51 | | (Tussilago farfara); (28) Japanese stilt grass (Microstegium vimineum); 24 |
---|
42 | 52 | | (29) common reed (Phragmites australis); (30) sycamore maple (Acer 25 |
---|
43 | 53 | | pseudoplatanus); (31) princess tree (Paulownia tomentosa); (32) white 26 |
---|
44 | 54 | | poplar (Populus alba); (33) false indigo (Amorpha fruticosa); (34) 27 |
---|
45 | 55 | | Russian olive (Eleagnus angustifolia); (35) wineberry (Rubus 28 |
---|
46 | 56 | | phoenicolasius); (36) kudzu (Pueraria montana); (37) Canada thistle 29 |
---|
47 | 57 | | (Cirsium arvense); (38) jimsonweed (Datura stramonium); (39) crested 30 |
---|
48 | 58 | | late-summer mint (Elsholtzia ciliata); (40) Cypress spurge (Euphorbia 31 |
---|
49 | 59 | | cyparissias); (41) slender snake cotton (Froelichia gracilis); (42) ground 32 |
---|
50 | 60 | | ivy (Glechoma hederacea); (43) giant hogweed (Heracleum 33 |
---|
51 | 61 | | mantegazzianum); (44) Japanese hops (Humulus japonicus); (45) 34 |
---|
52 | 62 | | ornamental jewelweed (Impatiens glanulifera); (46) common kochia 35 |
---|
53 | 63 | | (Kochia scoparia); (47) ragged robin (Lychnis flos-cuculi); (48) Scotch 36 |
---|
54 | 64 | | thistle (Onopordum acanthium); (49) bristle knotweed (Polygonum 37 |
---|
55 | 65 | | caespitosum); (50) giant knotweed (Polygonum sachalinense); (51) 38 |
---|
56 | 66 | | sheep sorrel (Rumex acetosella); (52) ragwort (Senecio jacobaea); (53) 39 |
---|
57 | 67 | | cup plant (Silphium perfoliatum); (54) bittersweet nightshade (Solanum 40 |
---|
58 | 68 | | dulcamara); (55) garden heliotrope (Valeriana officinalis); (56) hairy 41 |
---|
59 | 69 | | jointgrass (Arthraxon hispidus); (57) drooping brome-grass (Bromus 42 |
---|
60 | 70 | | tectorum); (58) Japanese sedge (Carex kobomugi); (59) reed managrass 43 |
---|
61 | 71 | | (Glyceria maxima); (60) Canada bluegrass (Poa compressa); [and] (61) 44 |
---|
62 | 72 | | tree of heaven (Ailanthus altissima); and (62) star of Bethlehem 45 |
---|
63 | 73 | | (Ornithogalum umbellatum). 46 |
---|
64 | 74 | | (b) (1) Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section and 47 |
---|
65 | 75 | | notwithstanding the provisions of any ordinance adopted by a 48 |
---|
66 | 76 | | municipality, on or after October 1, 2005, no person shall import, move, 49 |
---|
67 | 77 | | sell, purchase, transplant, cultivate or distribute any of the following 50 |
---|
68 | 78 | | invasive plants: (A) Purple loosestrife (Lythrum salicaria); (B) forget-51 |
---|
76 | 87 | | (G) European waterclover (Marsilea quadrifolia); (H) parrotfeather 55 |
---|
77 | 88 | | (Myriophyllum aquaticum); (I) brittle water-nymph (Najas minor); (J) 56 |
---|
78 | 89 | | American water lotus (Nelumbo lutea); (K) yellow floating heart 57 |
---|
79 | 90 | | (Nymphoides peltata); (L) onerow yellowcress (Rorippa microphylla); 58 |
---|
80 | 91 | | (M) watercress (Rorippa nasturtium-aquaticum), except for watercress 59 |
---|
81 | 92 | | sold for human consumption without its reproductive structure; (N) 60 |
---|
82 | 93 | | giant salvinia (Salvinia molesta); (O) yellow iris (Iris pseudacorus); (P) 61 |
---|
83 | 94 | | border privet (Ligustrum obtusifolium); (Q) tatarian honeysuckle 62 |
---|
84 | 95 | | (Lonicera tatarica); (R) dwarf honeysuckle (Lonicera xylosteum); and (S) 63 |
---|
85 | 96 | | garden loosetrife (Lysimachia vulgaris). 64 |
---|
86 | 97 | | (2) Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section and 65 |
---|
87 | 98 | | notwithstanding the provisions of any ordinance adopted by a 66 |
---|
88 | 99 | | municipality, on or after October 1, 2024, no person shall import, move, 67 |
---|
89 | 100 | | sell, purchase, transplant, cultivate or distribute any of the following 68 |
---|
90 | 101 | | invasive plants: (A) Porcelainberry (Ampelopsis brevipedunculata), (B) 69 |
---|
91 | 102 | | mugwort (Artemisia vulgaris), (C) quackgrass (Elymus repens), (D) 70 |
---|
92 | 103 | | Japanese angelica tree (Aralia elata), (E) Japanese wisteria (Wisteria 71 |
---|
93 | 104 | | floribunda), and (F) Chinese wisteria (Wisteria sinensis). 72 |
---|
94 | 105 | | (3) Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section and 73 |
---|
95 | 106 | | notwithstanding the provisions of any ordinance adopted by a 74 |
---|
96 | 107 | | municipality, on or after October 1, 2027, no person shall import, move, 75 |
---|
97 | 108 | | sell, purchase, transplant, cultivate or distribute callery pear (Pyrus 76 |
---|
98 | 109 | | calleryana). 77 |
---|
99 | 110 | | (4) Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section and 78 |
---|
100 | 111 | | notwithstanding the provisions of any ordinance adopted by a 79 |
---|
101 | 112 | | municipality, on or after October 1, 2028, no person shall import, move, 80 |
---|
102 | 113 | | sell, purchase, transplant, cultivate or distribute any of the following 81 |
---|
113 | 125 | | (5) Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section and 88 |
---|
114 | 126 | | notwithstanding the provisions of any ordinance adopted by a 89 |
---|
115 | 127 | | municipality, on or after October 1, 2030, no person shall import, move, 90 |
---|
116 | 128 | | sell, purchase, transplant, cultivate or distribute Norway maple (Acer 91 |
---|
117 | 129 | | platanoides). 92 |
---|
118 | 130 | | (c) Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section, and 93 |
---|
119 | 131 | | notwithstanding the provisions of any ordinance adopted by a 94 |
---|
120 | 132 | | municipality, no person shall move, import, sell, purchase, transplant, 95 |
---|
121 | 133 | | cultivate or distribute any reproductive portion of any invasive plant 96 |
---|
122 | 134 | | listed in subsection (a) or (b) of this section. For the purposes of this 97 |
---|
123 | 135 | | section, "reproductive portion" includes, but is not limited to, seeds, 98 |
---|
124 | 136 | | flowers, roots and tubers. 99 |
---|
125 | 137 | | (d) The provisions of subsections (a) to (c), inclusive, of this section 100 |
---|
126 | 138 | | shall not apply to the moving for eradication, research or educational 101 |
---|
127 | 139 | | purposes of any invasive plant listed in subsection (a) or (b) of this 102 |
---|
128 | 140 | | section or of any reproductive portion of such an invasive plant or to the 103 |
---|
129 | 141 | | cultivating for research purposes of any such plant or reproductive 104 |
---|
130 | 142 | | portion. 105 |
---|
131 | 143 | | (e) [From July 1, 2009, until October 1, 2014, no] No municipality shall 106 |
---|
132 | 144 | | adopt any ordinance regarding the retail sale or purchase of any 107 |
---|
133 | 145 | | invasive plant. 108 |
---|
134 | 146 | | (f) Any person who violates the provisions of this section shall be 109 |
---|
135 | 147 | | fined not more than one hundred dollars per plant. 110 |
---|
136 | 148 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
137 | 149 | | sections: |
---|
138 | 150 | | |
---|
139 | 151 | | Section 1 from passage 22a-381d |
---|