Connecticut 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06180 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO 1 of 3
43
5-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 6180
4+LCO No. 3902 1 of 4
5+
6+General Assembly Committee Bill No. 6180
67 January Session, 2025
8+LCO No. 3902
9+
10+
11+Referred to Committee on COMMITTEE ON CHILDREN
12+
13+
14+Introduced by:
15+(KID)
716
817
918
1019 AN ACT CONCERNING NOTICE OF FIREARMS BY OPERATORS OF
1120 FAMILY CHILD CARE HOMES.
1221 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
1322 Assembly convened:
1423
1524 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2025) (a) For the purposes of this 1
1625 section, "firearm" has the same meaning as provided in section 53a-3 of 2
1726 the general statutes. 3
1827 (b) Not later than January 1, 2026, and annually thereafter, each 4
1928 operator of a family child care home licensed pursuant to section 19a-5
20-87b of the general statutes, in which one or more firearms is stored, shall 6
21-provide written notification of the presence of each such firearm to a 7
29+97b of the general statutes, in which one or more firearms is stored, shall 6
30+provide written notification of the presence of each such firearm to the 7
2231 parent or guardian of each child enrolled in such home. Such 8
2332 notification shall (1) include a list of the number and type of each firearm 9
24-stored in such home, and (2) require a parent or guardian to 10
33+stored in such home, and (2) require such parent or guardian to 10
2534 acknowledge receipt of such notification by providing such parent or 11
26-guardian's signature. On and after January 1, 2026, such written 12
27-notification shall be provided to a parent or guardian of each child 13
35+guardian's signature. On and after January 1, 2027, such written 12
36+notification shall be provided to the parent or guardian of each child 13
2837 enrolling in any such home for the first time. Such operator shall 14
2938 maintain each signed acknowledgment of receipt for not less than three 15
3039 years, and make such signed acknowledgments available to the Office 16
40+Committee Bill No. 6180
41+
42+
43+LCO No. 3902 2 of 4
44+
3145 of Early Childhood for inspection upon request. 17
3246 (c) Not later than February 1, 2027, and annually thereafter, each 18
33-operator of a family child care home in which one or more firearms is 19 Substitute Bill No. 6180
34-
35-
36-LCO 2 of 3
37-
47+operator of a family child care home in which one or more firearms is 19
3848 stored shall, in a form and manner prescribed by the Commissioner of 20
3949 Early Childhood, confirm compliance with the provisions of subsection 21
4050 (b) of this section during the preceding calendar year. 22
4151 Sec. 2. Subsection (a) of section 19a-87e of the general statutes is 23
4252 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 24
4353 2025): 25
4454 (a) The Commissioner of Early Childhood may (1) refuse to license 26
4555 under section 19a-87b, a person to own, conduct, operate or maintain a 27
4656 family child care home, as defined in section 19a-77, (2) refuse to 28
4757 approve under section 19a-87b, a person to act as an assistant or 29
4858 substitute staff member in a family child care home, as defined in section 30
4959 19a-77, or (3) suspend or revoke the license or approval or take any other 31
5060 action that may be set forth in regulation that may be adopted pursuant 32
5161 to section 19a-79 if the person who owns, conducts, maintains or 33
5262 operates the family child care home, the person who acts as an assistant 34
5363 or substitute staff member in a family child care home, a person 35
5464 employed in such family child care home in a position connected with 36
5565 the provision of care to a child receiving child care services or a 37
5666 household member, as defined in subsection (c) of section 19a-87b, who 38
5767 is sixteen years of age or older and resides therein, has been convicted, 39
5868 in this state or any other state of a felony, as defined in section 53a-25, 40
5969 involving the use, attempted use or threatened use of physical force 41
6070 against another person, or has a criminal record in this state or any other 42
6171 state that the commissioner reasonably believes renders the person 43
6272 unsuitable to own, conduct, operate or maintain or be employed by a 44
6373 family child care home, or act as an assistant or substitute staff member 45
6474 in a family child care home, or if such persons or a household member 46
6575 has been convicted in this state or any other state of cruelty to persons 47
6676 under section 53-20, injury or risk of injury to or impairing morals of 48
77+Committee Bill No. 6180
78+
79+
80+LCO No. 3902 3 of 4
81+
6782 children under section 53-21, abandonment of children under the age of 49
6883 six years under section 53-23, or any felony where the victim of the 50
6984 felony is a child under eighteen years of age, a violation of section 53a-51
7085 70b of the general statutes, revision of 1958, revised to January 1, 2019, 52
71-or section 53a-70, 53a-70a, 53a-71, 53a-72a, 53a-72b or 53a-73a, illegal 53 Substitute Bill No. 6180
72-
73-
74-LCO 3 of 3
75-
86+or section 53a-70, 53a-70a, 53a-71, 53a-72a, 53a-72b or 53a-73a, illegal 53
7687 manufacture, distribution, sale, prescription, dispensing or 54
7788 administration under section 21a-277 or 21a-278, or illegal possession 55
7889 under section 21a-279, or if such person, a person who acts as assistant 56
7990 or substitute staff member in a family child care home or a person 57
8091 employed in such family child care home in a position connected with 58
8192 the provision of care to a child receiving child care services, either fails 59
8293 to substantially comply with the regulations adopted pursuant to 60
8394 section 19a-87b, or conducts, operates or maintains the home in a 61
84-manner [which] that endangers the health, safety and welfare of the 62
85-children receiving child care services, including, but not limited to, by a 63
86-failure to comply with the provisions of section 1 of this act. Any refusal 64
87-of a license or approval pursuant to this section shall be rendered in 65
95+manner which endangers the health, safety and welfare of the children 62
96+receiving child care services, including, but not limited to, failure to 63
97+comply with the provisions of section 1 of this act. Any refusal of a 64
98+license or approval pursuant to this section shall be rendered in 65
8899 accordance with the provisions of sections 46a-79 to 46a-81, inclusive. 66
89100 Any person whose license or approval has been revoked pursuant to 67
90101 this section shall be ineligible to apply for a license or approval for a 68
91102 period of one year from the effective date of revocation. 69
92103 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
93104 sections:
94105
95106 Section 1 July 1, 2025 New section
96107 Sec. 2 July 1, 2025 19a-87e(a)
97108
98-Statement of Legislative Commissioners:
99-In Section 1(b), "19a-97b" was changed to "19a-87b" for accuracy, and
100-"the parent" was changed to "a parent" for clarity; in Section 1(b)(2),
101-"such parent" was changed to "a parent" for clarity, and "2027" was
102-changed to "2026" for consistency; and in Section 2(a), "which
103-endangers" was changed to "[which] that endangers" for consistency
104-with standard drafting conventions, and "by a" was inserted before
105-"failure" for clarity.
109+Statement of Purpose:
110+To require (1) family child care home operators to notify parents and
111+guardians of the presence of firearms, and (2) the Office of Early
112+Childhood to take adverse licensing action against operators for
113+violation of said requirement.
106114
107-KID Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO
115+Committee Bill No. 6180
116+
117+
118+LCO No. 3902 4 of 4
119+
120+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
121+that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
122+underlined.]
123+
124+Co-Sponsors: REP. LINEHAN, 103rd Dist.
125+
126+H.B. 6180
108127