Connecticut 2025 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06185 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/03/2025

                             
 
LCO  	1 of 3 
  
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No.  6185  
January Session, 2025  
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE CONSUMPTION OF ENERGY DRINKS BY 
CHILDREN.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) For the purposes of this section, 1 
(1) "energy drink" means a soft drink that contains (A) not less than 2 
eighty milligrams of caffeine per nine fluid ounces, and (B) 3 
methylxanthines, B vitamins, one or more herbal ingredients or an 4 
ingredient labeled "energy blend", and (2) "social media" has the same 5 
meaning as provided in section 9-601 of the general statutes. 6 
(b) There is established a working group to (1) study the (A) medical 7 
risks associated with energy drink consumption by children, and (B) 8 
anticipated effects of a prohibition on the sale of energy drinks to 9 
children on (i) the state-wide sale of energy drinks, and (ii) public health, 10 
and (2) make recommendations for (A) a public awareness campaign 11 
concerning such risks that includes, but is not limited to, a video 12 
recording for publication or broadcast on television and social media, 13 
(B) notice to be posted at the point of sale of energy drinks in retail 14 
establishments alerting consumers to such risks, and (C) a one-page 15 
document explaining such risks. 16 
(c) The working group shall include, but need not be limited to, the 17 
following members, who shall be selected jointly by the Commissioners 18 
of Public Health and Consumer Protection: (1) The chairpersons and 19  Substitute Bill No. 6185 
 
 
LCO    	2 of 3 
 
ranking members of the joint standing committees of the General 20 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children and public 21 
health, (2) an individual with expertise in advertising and marketing, (3) 22 
a parent or guardian of a child who experienced adverse health 23 
conditions or died due to the consumption of energy drinks, (4) a 24 
pediatric cardiologist, (5) a representative of a state-wide chapter of a 25 
national association of pediatricians, (6) a representative of a state-wide 26 
governing body for interscholastic athletic activities, (7) a representative 27 
of the Connecticut Children's Medical Center, (8) a representative of a 28 
state-wide association of food retailers, wholesalers, distributors and 29 
service providers, (9) a representative of a manufacturer of energy 30 
drinks, (10) the Commissioner of Public Health, or the commissioner's 31 
designee, and (11) a licensed athletic trainer. The Commissioner of 32 
Public Health, or the commissioner's designee, shall serve as 33 
chairperson of the working group. The administrative staff of the joint 34 
standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of 35 
matters relating to children shall serve as administrative staff of the 36 
working group. 37 
(d) Not later than November 1, 2025, the chairperson of the working 38 
group shall submit a report on the working group's study and 39 
recommendations to the joint standing committees of the General 40 
Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children, public 41 
health and consumer protection in accordance with the provisions of 42 
section 11-4a of the general statutes. 43 
Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2025) (a) For the purposes of this 44 
section, "energy drink" means a soft drink that contains (1) not less than 45 
eighty milligrams of caffeine per nine fluid ounces, and (2) 46 
methylxanthines, B vitamins, one or more herbal ingredients or an 47 
ingredient labeled "energy blend". 48 
(b) Not later than December 1, 2025, the Department of Consumer 49 
Protection shall develop a notice alerting consumers to the medical risks 50 
associated with energy drink consumption by children and make a copy 51 
of such notice available on the department's Internet web site. Such 52  Substitute Bill No. 6185 
 
 
LCO    	3 of 3 
 
notice shall incorporate the recommendations submitted by the working 53 
group established pursuant to section 1 of this act. 54 
(c) On and after January 1, 2026, each individual, firm, fiduciary, 55 
partnership, corporation, limited liability company, trust or association 56 
engaged in the business of selling energy drinks to retail consumers in 57 
the state shall post a copy of the notice developed pursuant to subsection 58 
(b) of this section in a conspicuous place at the point of sale of such 59 
energy drinks. 60 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 from passage New section 
Sec. 2 July 1, 2025 New section 
 
Statement of Legislative Commissioners:   
In Section 1(a), the existing subdivision designators were changed to 
subparagraph designators "(A)" and "(B)" and a new subdivision "(1)" 
designator and a subdivision "(2)" designator were added for clarity; in 
Section 1(c), "commissioners, or their designees, shall serve as 
cochairpersons" was changed to "Commissioner of Public Health, or the 
commissioner's designee, shall serve as chairperson" for consistency; 
and in Section 2(b), the two references to "signage" were changed to 
"notice" for consistency. 
 
KID Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO